Krishnan v. Ebert
Appellee: Carey D Ebert
Appellant: Muralidharan Krishnan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00637
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues by Muralidharan Krishnan re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Movant's Exhibit 1, #2 Movant's Exhibit 2, #3 Movant's Exhibit 3, #4 Movant's Exhibit 4, #5 Movant's Exhibit 5, #6 Movant's Exhibit 6, #7 Debtor's Exhibit C, #8 Debtor's Exhibit D, #9 Debtor's Exhibit E)(daj, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 2 of 2)(daj, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE. Pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and (3) and the local rules for the assignment of duties to United States magistrate judges, the Court hereby REFERS this case to the Honorable Roy S. Payne for all pretrial purposes. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/11/2019. (daj, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to H. Jefferson LeForce on behalf of Carey D Ebert (LeForce, H.)
September 3, 2019 Electronic case file is in Bankruptcy Court. Please refer to the Bankruptcy Pacer site @ https://ecf.txeb.uscourts.gov to view/retrieve the record. (daj, )
September 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
September 3, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (daj, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BK19-41644. File received via Bankruptcy Court, filed by Muralidharan Krishnan. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Order on Appeal)(daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krishnan v. Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carey D Ebert
Represented By: H. Jefferson LeForce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Muralidharan Krishnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?