Scott v. Quiktrip Corporation
Plaintiff: Leslie M. Scott
Defendant: Quiktrip Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00664
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/4/2019. (rpc, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2020 at 03:00 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak., Amended Pleadings due by 6/7/2020., Discovery due by 5/24/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2019., Jury instructions due by 8/5/2020, Jury Selection/Trial set for 9/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Designation of Mediator due by 11/10/2019,, Motions due by 6/21/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/4/2019. (rpc, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, November 7, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/4/2019. (rpc, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order and Docket Control by Quiktrip Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discovery Order, #2 Exhibit Docket Control Order)(Lightfoot, Seth)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order and Docket Control by Quiktrip Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Discovery Order, #2 Exhibit Joint Proposed Docket Control Order)(Lightfoot, Seth)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/8/2019. (rpc, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/8/2019. (rpc, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Belvin R Harris on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7439037. (Harris, Belvin)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. The Court REFERS the above-styled and numbered civil action to United States Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak to conduct all pretrial proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/16/2019. (rpc, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Quiktrip Corporation. (Briscoe, Bryan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Petition by Quiktrip Corporation.(rpc, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Quiktrip Corporation, filed by Leslie M. Scott.(rpc, )
September 13, 2019 Notified Plaintiff's Attorney, Belvin R. Harris, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc, )
September 13, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
September 12, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (rpc, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Quiktrip Corporation Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons (Briscoe, Bryan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Quiktrip Corporation from County Court at Law of Cooke Cou nty, case number CV1901705. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7434427), filed by Quiktrip Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit Certified Copy of State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Original Answer, #5 Exhibit Return of Service of Process, #6 Exhibit Case Information Sheet, #7 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Briscoe, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Quiktrip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quiktrip Corporation
Represented By: Seth Ryan Lightfoot
Represented By: Bryan Kyle Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?