Largan Precision Co., Ltd. v. Ability Opto-Electronics Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Largan Precision Co., Ltd.
Defendant: HP Inc., Ability Opto-Electronics Technology Co., Ltd. and Newmax Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00696
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for HP Inc. to 12/2/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HP Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
November 5, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ability Opto-Electronics Technology Co., Ltd. to 12/5/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ability Opto-Electronics Technology Co., Ltd.( Sigler, Roy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Largan Precision Co., Ltd.. Newmax Technology Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Sigler, Roy)
October 16, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for HP Inc. to 11/17/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re HP Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
October 8, 2019 Per Order #11 , summons to Newmax Technology Co., Ltd. shipped via FedEx, tracking number 7765 0468 8328. (rpc, )
October 8, 2019 Per Order #11 , summons to Ability Opto-Electronics Technology Co., Ltd. shipped via FedEx, tracking number 7765 0421 7060. (rpc, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Service of Process by Mail Under Rule 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) and Rule 4(h)(2). Largan shall pre-pay or reimburse the Court for any cost of sending the documents. Largan is directed to promptly provide to the Clerk's Office copies of the papers to be served. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/3/2019. (rpc, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION Service of Process by Mail by Largan Precision Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sigler, Roy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ken K Fung on behalf of Largan Precision Co., Ltd. (Fung, Ken)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to HP Inc. (rpc, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Newmax Technology Co., Ltd. (rpc, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Ability Opto-Electronics Technology Co., Ltd. (rpc, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Auchter Allgood on behalf of Largan Precision Co., Ltd. (Allgood, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Roy William Sigler on behalf of Largan Precision Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7450991. (Sigler, Roy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fisch, Alan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Largan Precision Co., Ltd. (Fisch, Alan)
September 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
September 25, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7450853.), filed by Largan Precision Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '518 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '691 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '796 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '378 Patent, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisch, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Largan Precision Co., Ltd. v. Ability Opto-Electronics Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ability Opto-Electronics Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmax Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Largan Precision Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Alan Michael Fisch
Represented By: Roy William Sigler
Represented By: Ken K Fung
Represented By: Adam Auchter Allgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?