S3G Technology LLC v. RE/MAX LLC
Plaintiff: S3G Technology LLC
Defendant: RE/MAX LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00697
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for RE/MAX LLC to 12/5/2019. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re RE/MAX LLC.( Pegues, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for RE/MAX LLC to 11/14/2019. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RE/MAX LLC (Pegues, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re RE/MAX LLC.( Pegues, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Aaron Wietjes on behalf of RE/MAX LLC (Wietjes, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Pegues on behalf of RE/MAX LLC (Pegues, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica P.G. Newman on behalf of S3G Technology LLC (Newman, Jessica)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory S Cordrey on behalf of S3G Technology LLC (Cordrey, Gregory)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley M Gibson on behalf of S3G Technology LLC (Gibson, Stanley)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S3G Technology LLC. S3G Technology LLC served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to RE/MAX LLC. (rpc, )
September 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
September 25, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by S3G Technology LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against RE/MAX LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7451274.), filed by S3G Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S3G Technology LLC v. RE/MAX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RE/MAX LLC
Represented By: Michael David Pegues
Represented By: Jason Aaron Wietjes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S3G Technology LLC
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Gregory S Cordrey
Represented By: Jessica P.G. Newman
Represented By: Stanley M Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?