Lorance v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Margie Lorance
Defendant: General Motors and General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00718
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/27/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 11/21/2019. (rpc, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 11/6/2019. (rpc, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Motors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent General Motors Company, a Delaware Corporation for General Motors, LLC. (Wade, Deron)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Motors, LLC.(Cosse, Clay)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (rpc, )
October 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 2, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7461677.), filed by Margie Lorance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tracy, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorance v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Clay A Cosse
Represented By: Deron Lynn Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Lorance
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Andrew Galen Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?