Carmel Capital, LLC v. Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carmel Capital, LLC
Defendant: W. Harry Ridge, III, Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC and Metroplex Capital Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00725
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #11 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope(s))(baf, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by W. Harry Ridge, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement, #3 Envelope(s))(baf, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. Metroplex Capital Corporation served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Janik, Glenn)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. W. Harry Ridge, III served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Janik, Glenn)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Janik, Glenn)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/7/2019. (baf, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Janik, Glenn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to W. Harry Ridge, III. (rpc, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Metroplex Capital Corporation. (rpc, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC. (rpc, )
October 4, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 4, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Carmel Capital, LLC (Janik, Glenn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7464801.), filed by Carmel Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Janik, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmel Capital, LLC v. Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Harry Ridge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metroplex Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmel Capital, LLC
Represented By: Sean Nean Hsu
Represented By: Rajkumar Vinnakota
Represented By: Glenn Edward Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?