Wild v. RAINWATER EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: Alexander Lewis Wild
Defendant: RAINWATER EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00755
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Alexander Lewis Wild (Rothman, Joel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by RAINWATER EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INC.. (Levine, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
November 12, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for RAINWATER EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INC. to 12/11/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re RAINWATER EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INC..( Levine, Stephen) Modified on 11/12/2019 (baf, ).
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Lewis Wild. (Rothman, Joel)
October 28, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED submitted DOCUMENT #5 - THE COMPLETE TWO PAGE SUMMONS MUST BE FILED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Lewis Wild. RAINWATER EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INC. served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Rothman, Joel) Modified on 10/28/2019 (baf, ).
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alexander Lewis Wild (Rothman, Joel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to RAINWATER EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INC.. (baf, )
October 16, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
October 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Rothman, Joel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMANDED) against RAINWATER EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7480529.), filed by Alexander Lewis Wild. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, (Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wild v. RAINWATER EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Lewis Wild
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAINWATER EXTERMINATING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Stephen Lloyd Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?