Vu v. RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonny Vu
Defendant: RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00757
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of New Hampshire; Case Number 1:19-cv-00680. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 16, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (js) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ///ORDER granting #14 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction; denying #15 Motion to Change Venue. Instead of dismissing the case outright, the court will transfer this case to another forum with such jurisdiction pursuant to its authority under 28 U.S.C. 1631. The court directs the Clerk's Office to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan C. Carrier on behalf of Sonny Vu Attorney Megan C. Carrier added to party Sonny Vu(pty:pla).(Carrier, Megan) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald L. Smith on behalf of RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. Attorney Donald L. Smith added to party RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft).(Smith, Donald) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. MOTION HEARING held on 10/11/2019 re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #15 Amended MOTION to Change Venue. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock) (Pltfs Atty: Megan Carrier) (Defts Atty: Donald Smith, Whitney Warren via telephone)(Total Hearing Time: 30 minutes) (js) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Assented to Motion to Allow Appearance of Lead Defense Counsel Telephonically at 10/11/19 Motion Hearing. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Counsel shall email contact information to the case manger at jennifer_sackos@nhd.uscourts.gov(js) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION to Allow Appearance of Lead Defense Counsel Telephonically at 10/11/19 Motion Hearing filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc..(Johnson, Matthew) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
September 5, 2019 NOTICE re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #15 Amended MOTION to Change Venue. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #15 Amended MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. Surreply due by 9/3/2019. (Johnson, Matthew) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. Surreply due by 9/3/2019. (Johnson, Matthew) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 26, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 7/21/2020 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2020 03:00 PM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Pretrial Statements due 6/22/2020. JERS Statement due 6/22/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 7/6/2020.(js) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER approving with changes #16 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 3/23/2020. Discovery deadline 5/22/2020. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 3/23/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 12/2/2019.(js) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 OBJECTION to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Sonny Vu. Follow up on Reply on 8/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff Sonny Vu's Objection to Defendant RSI Racing Solutions Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Declaration of Sonny Vu, #3 Exhibit B-Email chain between W. Hamblin and S. Vu, #4 Exhibit C-RSI's website and Facebook page)(Herz, Courtney) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 FILED IN ERROR. OBJECTION to #15 Amended MOTION to Change Venue filed by Sonny Vu. Follow up on Reply on 8/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff Sonny Vu's Objection to Defendant RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.'s Amended Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Declaration of Sonny Vu, #3 Exhibit B-District Court Judicial Caseload Profiles)(Herz, Courtney) Modified on 8/22/2019 to add: Filed in error text(js). [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 OBJECTION to #15 Amended MOTION to Change Venue filed by Sonny Vu. Follow up on Reply on 8/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Pltf Sonny Vu's Obj to Def RSI Racing Solution Inc.'s Amended Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Declaration of Sonny Vu, #3 Exhibit B-District Court Judicial Caseload Profiles)(Herz, Courtney) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Sonny Vu. (Herz, Courtney) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Motions terminated: #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. MOTION REFILED. SEE DOCUMENT NO. 15. (js) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Affidavit of William Hamblin III, #3 Exhibit A-1 October 2015 email chain, #4 Exhibit A-2 Contrct, #5 Exhibit A-3 Sale Order, #6 Exhibit A-4 Texas Liability Insurance Card, #7 Exhibit A-5 January 2016 email chain)(Johnson, Matthew) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Affidavit of William Hamblin III, #3 Exhibit A-1 October 2015 email chain, #4 Exhibit A-2 Contract, #5 Exhibit A-3 Sale Order, #6 Exhibit A-4 Texas Liability Insurance Card, #7 Exhibit A-5 January 2016 email chain)(Johnson, Matthew) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss. Text of Order: Denied as moot in light of the Amended Complaint filed on August 1, 2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Sonny Vu. Follow up on Reply on 8/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff Sonny Vu's Objection to Defendant RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas, #2 Exhibit A to Memo of Law - Declaration of Sonny Vu, #3 Exhibit B to Memo of Law - judicial caseload profiles)(Herz, Courtney) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sonny Vu. Follow up on Reply on 8/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Sonny Vu's Objection to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sonny Vu, #3 Exhibit B - Email, #4 Exhibit C - Website and Facebook)(Herz, Courtney) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. with jury demand filed by Sonny Vu.(Herz, Courtney) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to Motion for Robert J. Bogdanowicz III to Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Robert J. Bogdanowicz III, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(de) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to Motion for Whitney L. Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Whitney L. Warren, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(de) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Robert J. Bogdanowicz III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1841033.) filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Robert Bogdanowicz III)(Johnson, Matthew) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Whitney L. Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1841031.) filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Whitney Warren, Esq.)(Johnson, Matthew) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Assented to Motion for John C. Scheller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that John C. Scheller, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/5/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to Motion for Anne T. Freeland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Anne T. Freeland, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/5/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for John C. Scheller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1840001.) filed by Sonny Vu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) John C. Scheller)(Herz, Courtney) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Anne T. Freeland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1839939.) filed by Sonny Vu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Anne T. Freeland, Esq.)(Herz, Courtney) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Devin K. Bolger on behalf of RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. Attorney Devin K. Bolger added to party RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bolger, Devin) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 19, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. JOINT Discovery Plan DUE BY 8/23/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 REFILED. SEE DOCUMENT NO. 15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of William S. Hamblin, III, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-1 to Hamblin Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex. A-2 to Hamblin Affidavit)(Johnson, Matthew) Modified on 8/9/2019 to add: Refiled text(js). [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Matthew R. Johnson added to party RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of William S. Hamblin, III, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-1 to Hamblin Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex. A-2 to Hamblin Affidavit)(Johnson, Matthew) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. by Sonny Vu. Served/Mailed on 6/25/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/16/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Herz, Courtney) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
June 21, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-680-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1829399 filed by Sonny Vu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Herz, Courtney) [Transferred from New Hampshire on 10/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vu v. RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney L. Warren
Represented By: Robert J. Bogdanowicz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?