Barrow v. Sellers et al
Plaintiff: Adam I Barrow
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Thomas M Sellers
Case Number: 4:2019cv00797
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to 1/10/2020; Thomas M Sellers to 1/10/2020. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Falls, Clayton)
November 27, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Thomas M Sellers to 12/27/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Thomas M Sellers.( Falls, Clayton)
November 25, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to 12/27/2019. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..( Falls, Clayton)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (baf, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Thomas M Sellers. (baf, )
November 1, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
November 1, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7503103.), filed by Adam I Barrow, J.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for writ of garnishment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Agreed judgment of garnishment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Barrow's motion for new trial, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Wells Fargo's response to motion for new trial, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Barrow's reply to Wells Fargo's response, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Order denying motion for new trial, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Memorandum Opinion from Fort Worth Court of Appeals, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Email with expenses of appeal)(Jarzombek, Jerry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (baf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrow v. Sellers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Clayton Lanier Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M Sellers
Represented By: Clayton Lanier Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam I Barrow
Represented By: Jerry J Jarzombek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?