Cunningham v. TK Supplements, Inc.
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: TK Supplements, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00816
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/6/2020. (rpc, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Answer and Defenses to the Class Action Compliant by Defendant TK Supplements, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TK Supplements, Inc..(Aurzada, Keith)
December 9, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for TK Supplements, Inc. to 1/8/2020. (rpc, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/9/2019. (rpc, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by TK Supplements, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurzada, Keith)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. TK Supplements, Inc. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Fein, Cory)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Paronich on behalf of Craig Cunningham. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7521360. (Paronich, Anthony)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to TK Supplements, Inc. (rpc, )
November 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
November 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TK Supplements, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7517219.), filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fein, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. TK Supplements, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Represented By: Cory S. Fein
Represented By: Anthony Paronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Supplements, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Miles Aurzada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?