Loyd D. Johnson Family Limited Partnership No. 1 et al v. North Texas Municipal Water District et al
Plaintiff: LDJ Operations, LLC and Loyd D. Johnson Family Limited Partnership No. 1
Defendant: North Texas Municipal Water District and Phillips and Jordan, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00866
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Phillips and Jordan, Inc. (Ziegler, Gregory)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by LDJ Operations, LLC, Loyd D. Johnson Family Limited Partnership No. 1 (Hurt, Matthew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by North Texas Municipal Water District (Bauerlein, Chapman)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by LDJ Operations, LLC, Loyd D. Johnson Family Limited Partnership No. 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hurt, Matthew)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Joint and Agreed Motion for (1) Extension of Time and Page Limit Extension for Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant P& J's Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Remand, (2) Extension of Time to Complete Initial Mandatory Disclosure, and (3) Extension of Time to Provide the Court the Parties' Joint Report of Attorney Conference seeking the extension of time for the deadlines above and a page limit extension. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/9/2020. (daj, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Response to Motion for Remand by LDJ Operations, LLC, Loyd D. Johnson Family Limited Partnership No. 1. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurt, Matthew)
January 6, 2020 Counsel are advised that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits. (tls)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Phillips and Jordan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ziegler, Gregory)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Brief in Support filed by Phillips and Jordan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ziegler, Gregory) Modified on 1/3/2020 (rpc, ).
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Phillips and Jordan, Inc.. (Ziegler, Gregory) Modified on 1/3/2020 (rpc, ).
January 3, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and #10 RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Brief in Support submitted by Phillips and Jordan, Inc. The Response and Brief in Support should be filed as one document. See Local Rule CV-7(d). Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Phillips and Jordan, Inc. of Correction of Exhibit H to its Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H)(Ziegler, Gregory)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by LDJ Operations, LLC, Loyd D. Johnson Family Limited Partnership No. 1. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hurt, Matthew)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/16/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/12/2019. (rpc, )
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: January 2, 2020. File joint report of attorney conference: December 26, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Thursday, January30, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. at the Paul Brown United States Courthouse, 101 E. PecanStreet, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/11/2019. (daj, )
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/22/2019. (rpc, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Petition, by North Texas Municipal Water District.(rpc, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against North Texas Municipal Water District, Phillips and Jordan, Inc., filed by Loyd D. Johnson Family Limited Partnership No. 1, LDJ Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(rpc, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Phillips and Jordan, Inc. from 336th District Court, case number CV-19-44384. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7540443), filed by Phillips and Jordan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H (see corrected Exhibit H, Dkt. #8 ), #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit C)(Ziegler, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (rpc, ). Modified on 12/27/2019 (rpc, ).
November 22, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
November 22, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loyd D. Johnson Family Limited Partnership No. 1 et al v. North Texas Municipal Water District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Texas Municipal Water District
Represented By: Lewis L Isaacks
Represented By: David M Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips and Jordan, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Johnathan Bell
Represented By: William Ivan Gardner
Represented By: Gregory Norman Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LDJ Operations, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Michiel Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loyd D. Johnson Family Limited Partnership No. 1
Represented By: Matthew Michiel Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?