Foster v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John E. Foster
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC, Encore Capital Group, Inc. and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00869
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC.(Teters, Kevin)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - GRANTING #16 Motion to Set Aside Default Clerk's Default and for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk's entries of default (Dkts. #14 , #15 ) are, therefore, VACATED. Additionally, Defendants' time to file their responses to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended, through and including Friday, January 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 1/6/2020. (baf, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default and Extend Time to Respond by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Teters, Kevin)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 ***VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER #17 ***Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Midland Funding, LLC (baf, ) Modified on 1/6/2020 (baf, ).
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 ***VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER #17 ***Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (baf, ) Modified on 1/6/2020 (baf, ).
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 Request by John E. Foster for Clerk's Entry of Default against Midland Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Daher, Marwan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 Request by John E. Foster for Clerk's Entry of Default against Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Daher, Marwan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John E. Foster. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John E. Foster. Midland Funding, LLC served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John E. Foster. Encore Capital Group, Inc. served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar)
December 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (kls, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER assigning case to Judge Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/9/2019.
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (baf, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Midland Funding, LLC. (baf, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (baf, )
November 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
November 25, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander James Adducci Taylor on behalf of John E. Foster (Taylor, Alexander)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marwan Rocco Daher on behalf of John E. Foster (Daher, Marwan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Omar Tayseer Sulaiman on behalf of John E. Foster (Sulaiman, Omar)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7542845.), filed by John E. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sulaiman, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Foster
Represented By: Marwan Rocco Daher
Represented By: Alexander James Adducci Taylor
Represented By: Omar Tayseer Sulaiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Kevin A Teters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin A Teters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin A Teters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?