American Builders Insurance Company v. Peterson Construction, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY, and American Builders Insurance Company
Defendant: MCALLEN CONVENTION CENTER HOTEL, LLLP, The Hanover Insurance Company, PETERSON CONSTRUCTION, INC., MARIA MARTINEZ, MIGUEL PALACIOS, THE HANOVER AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, MCALLEN STRATEGIC GROUP, LLC, and McAllen Strategic Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00085
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Maria Martinez, Miguel Palacios.(Rosales, Marcos)
April 3, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #18 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by American Builders Insurance Company.(Curran, Alicia)
April 3, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Maria Martinez to 4/4/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
April 3, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Miguel Palacios to 4/4/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Maria Martinez.( Rosales, Marcos)
April 3, 2020 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Miguel Palacios.( Rosales, Marcos)
April 2, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dawn W Hansen on behalf of McAllen Convention Center Hotel, LLLP, McAllen Strategic Group, LLC (Hansen, Dawn)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/21/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 4/2/2020. (rpc, )
March 25, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 22 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Peterson Construction, Inc..(Gurwitz, Daniel)
March 12, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Peterson Construction, Inc. to 3/23/2020. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Peterson Construction, Inc..( Gurwitz, Daniel)
March 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel G. Gurwitz on behalf of Peterson Construction, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7705574. (Gurwitz, Daniel)
March 9, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS this case to U. S. Magistrate Kimberly Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/6/2020. (baf, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 18 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by McAllen Convention Center Hotel, LLLP, McAllen Strategic Group, LLC, The Hanover American Insurance Company, The Hanover Insurance Company.(Hogue, Robert)
February 25, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Builders Insurance Company. Miguel Palacios served on 2/17/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Curran, Alicia)
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Builders Insurance Company. Maria Martinez served on 2/17/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Curran, Alicia)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Builders Insurance Company. Peterson Construction, Inc. served on 2/17/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Curran, Alicia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Builders Insurance Company. The Hanover Insurance Company served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (Curran, Alicia)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Builders Insurance Company. The Hanover American Insurance Company served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (Curran, Alicia)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Builders Insurance Company. McAllen Strategic Group, LLC served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (Curran, Alicia)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Builders Insurance Company. McAllen Convention Center Hotel, LLLP served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (Curran, Alicia)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to The Hanover Insurance Company. (baf, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to McAllen Convention Center Hotel, LLLP. (baf, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Miguel Palacios. (baf, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to The Hanover American Insurance Company. (baf, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Maria Martinez. (baf, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to McAllen Strategic Group, LLC. (baf, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Peterson Construction, Inc.. (baf, )
February 7, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD. Document # 3, ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT TO MAIN DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es))(Curran, Alicia) Modified on 2/7/2020 (baf, ).
February 5, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
February 5, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY, identifying Corporate Parent Builders Insurance Group, Inc. for AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY,. (Curran, Alicia)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7648229.), filed by AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curran, Alicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Builders Insurance Company v. Peterson Construction, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCALLEN CONVENTION CENTER HOTEL, LLLP
Represented By: Robert Glenn Hogue
Represented By: Dawn W Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Glenn Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETERSON CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: Rebecca Suzanne DiMasi
Represented By: Daniel G. Gurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: Marcos Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGUEL PALACIOS
Represented By: Marcos Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HANOVER AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Glenn Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCALLEN STRATEGIC GROUP, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAllen Strategic Group, LLC
Represented By: Robert Glenn Hogue
Represented By: Dawn W Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY,
Represented By: Alicia G Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Builders Insurance Company
Represented By: Alicia G Curran
Represented By: Alissa Kirksey Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?