In Re: Ayati-Ghaffari
Appellant: Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari
Trustee: Carey D Ebert
Case Number: 4:2020cv00106
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari as to #5 Order. (daj, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Appellant Ayati-Ghaffari is ordered to file and serve his brief on the merits within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/30/2020. (daj, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal Transmitted to District Court.COMPLETE RECORD Filed. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal (No Items Designated))(ldc, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcie Lynn Schout on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Schout, Marcie)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. Pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and (3) and the local rules for the assignment of duties to United States magistrate judges, the Court hereby REFERS this case to the Honorable Roy S. Payne for all pretrial purposes. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/2020. (daj, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BK18-41997. File received from US Bankruptcy Court, filed by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Cover Sheet, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #3 Order on Appeal)(daj, )
February 13, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (daj, )
February 13, 2020 Electronic case file is in Bankruptcy Court. Please refer to the Bankruptcy Pacer site @ https://ecf.txeb.uscourts.gov to view/retrieve the record. (daj, )
February 13, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Ayati-Ghaffari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Carey D Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?