Mendez v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eliezar Mendez
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00150
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
Presiding Judge: Christine A Nowak
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 CONSOLIDATED LEAD CASE: 4:19-cv-599; CONSOLIDATED MEMEBER CASES: 4:20-cv-150; 4:20-cv-151; 4:20-cv-152; 4:20-cv-153; 4:20-cv-154; 4:20-cv-155; 4:20-cv-156; 4:20-cv-157; 4:20-cv-158; 4:20-cv-159; 4:20-cv-160; 4:20-cv-161; 4:20-cv-162; 4:20-cv-163; and 4:20-cv-164. These cases are consolidated for pretrial purposes only and, if these cases proceed to trial, shall be set for individual trials. All future filings in this matter shall be docketed under civil action number 4:19-cv-599, which shall be designated as the LEAD CASE. Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-00599-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00150-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00151-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00152-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00153-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00154-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00155-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00156-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00157-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00158-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00159-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00160-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00161-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00162-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00163-RWS-CAN, 4:20-cv-00164-RWS-CAN(baf, )
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall consolidate civil action numbers: 4:19-cv-599; 4:20-cv-150; 4:20-cv-151; 4:20-cv-152; 4:20-cv-153; 4:20-cv-154; 4:20-cv-155; 4:20-cv-156; 4:20-cv-157; 4:20-cv-158; 4:20-cv-159; 4:20-cv-160; 4:20-cv-161; 4:20-cv-162; 4:20-cv-163; and 4:20-cv-164. These cases are consolidated for pretrial purposes only and, if these cases proceed to trial, shall be set for individual trials. It is finally ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket all future filings in this matter under civil action number 4:19-cv-599, which shall be designated as the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/8/2020. (baf, )
April 7, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. Document # 8, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eliezar Mendez.(Raburn, Jonathan)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY*** MOTION for Leave to File by Eliezar Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raburn, Jonathan) Modified on 4/7/2020 (baf, ).
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Time to Amend Complaint [Dkt. #6 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than April 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/1/2020. (baf, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Eliezar Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raburn, Jonathan)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2020 at 1:00 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2020. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 3/5/2020 for Plaintiff and by 3/30/2020 for Defendant. Proposed Jury instructions with citation to authority and Form of the Verdict for jury trials due by 9/13/2020. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Mediation Completion due by 3/5/2020. Dispositive Motions from all parties and any other motions that may require a hearing (including Daubert motions) due by 8/18/2020. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2020. EXPECTED TRAIL LENGTH: 3 DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/2/2020. (baf, )
February 27, 2020 Case REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (baf, )
February 27, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. It is therefore ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion to Sever and Consolidate for Discovery Purposes (Docket No. 14) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall sever Plaintiffs' claims into individual suits, each bearing a separate cause number, and to include in each cause a copy of the following: (1) Plaintiffs' original Complaint (Docket No. 1); (2) Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Docket No. 4); (3) Defendant's Answer (Docket No. 8); and (4) a copy of this Memorandum. The original Complaint in each new cause shall be deemed filed as of August 11, 2019, except for Plaintiff Jasmyn Roberts, whose Complaint shall be deemed filed as of August 30, 2019. It is finally ORDERED that each of Plaintiffs shall file a further amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Memorandum. Once severed, the Clerk of Court shall then consolidate the individual cases for pretrial purposes only. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/27/2020. (baf, ) SEVERED CASE NUMBERS: 4:20cv150, 4:20cv151, 4:20cv152, 4:20cv153, 4:20cv154, 4:20cv155, 4:20cv156, 4:20cv157, 4:20cv158, 4:20cv159, 4:20cv160, 4:20cv161, 4:20cv162, 4:20cv163, 4:20cv164.
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(baf, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed by Eliezar Mendez.(baf, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed by Eliezar Mendez. ***COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED AS OF AUGUST 11, 2019 PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM 17 ENTERED 2/27/2020 IN CASE 4:19CV599***(baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezar Mendez
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Represented By: Dennis Dean McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Syed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?