Origin Bank v. Krusinowski et al
Plaintiff: Origin Bank
Defendant: Robert Krusinowski, Jr. and Lisa Ann Edge
Case Number: 4:2020cv00168
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order as to Defendant Lisa Ann Edge by Origin Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Jonathan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Lisa Ann Edge served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Smith, Jonathan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint by Origin Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Jonathan)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Robert Krusinowski, Jr.(rpc, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Origin Bank. Robert Krusinowski, Jr served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Smith, Jonathan)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Kimberly Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/6/2020. (rpc, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Lisa Ann Edge. (rpc, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Robert Krusinowski, Jr. (rpc, )
February 28, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
February 28, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Origin Bank (Cronenwett, Mark)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7687194.), filed by Origin Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Origin Bank v. Krusinowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Origin Bank
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Jonathan Caleb Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Krusinowski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ann Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?