Johnson et al v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Johnson and Roslyn Johnson
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC, Flagstar Bank, Inc. and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00274
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Rule 16 management conference is converted to a Telephone Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 5/25/2020. (rpc, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manning, Matt)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/21/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 03:00 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/17/2020. (rpc, )
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 4/17/2020. (rpc, )
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/15/2020. (rpc, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bayview MSR Opportunity Corp. for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Manning, Matt)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Flagstar Bank, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flagstar Bancorp Inc., Other Affiliate MP Thrift Investments L.P. for Flagstar Bank, Inc.. (Manning, Matt)
April 2, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
April 2, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Flagstar Bank, F.S.B., Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC from 429th Collin County, case number 429-01198-2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7735474), filed by Flagstar Bank, F.S.B., Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manning, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Johnson
Represented By: John Gannon Helstowski
Represented By: Jason Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roslyn Johnson
Represented By: John Gannon Helstowski
Represented By: Jason Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, Inc.
Represented By: Matt D Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Matt D Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?