Brown et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon, the Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for CIT Home Equity Loan Trust 2002-2
Plaintiff: Ruby Brown and Estate of Bobby Brown
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, the Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for CIT Home Equity Loan Trust 2002-2 and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 4:2020cv00320
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. This Order shall govern proceedings in this case. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 7/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/2/2020. (baf, )
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 5/13/2020. (baf, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 5/1/2020. (baf, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by The Bank of New York Mellon.(baf, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against The Bank of New York Mellon, filed by Bobby Brown, Ruby Brown.(baf, )
April 15, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
April 15, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Bank of New York Mellon, the Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for CIT Home Equity Loan Trust 2002-2 from 158th District Court of Denton Co., case number 20-1976-158. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7752936), filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, the Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for CIT Home Equity Loan Trust 2002-2. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Ex A Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B List of Parties & Current Status, #3 Exhibit C Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit C-1 Verified Petition, #5 Exhibit C-2 Doc Records Request Form, #6 Exhibit C-3 Letter Requesting Citation, #7 Exhibit C-4 Citation-BONY, #8 Exhibit C-5 ROS Citation-BONY, #9 Exhibit C-6 Answer & Affirmative Defenses, #10 Exhibit D List of Counsel, #11 Exhibit E Name of State Court & Info, #12 Exhibit F Denton Co Appraisal District Valuation, #13 Exhibit G Notice of Jury Request, #14 Exhibit H COIP)(Sanders, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon, the Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for CIT Home Equity Loan Trust 2002-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, the Successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for CIT Home Equity Loan Trust 2002-2
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Brown
Represented By: John Gannon Helstowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Bobby Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?