Wiley , et al v. Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Individually Laura Annette Lowry, As Trustee Laura Annette Lowry, Bettye Wiley Neely, Aubrey Eugene Wiley and Laura Annette Lowry
Defendant: Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00345
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - GRANTING #13 Motion to Withdraw Temporary Restraining Order. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order, (Dkt. #10 ), is WITHDRAWN. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 6/18/2020. (baf, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw Temporary Restraining Order by Laura Annette Lowry, Bettye Wiley Neely, Aubrey Eugene Wiley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2020) (baf, ).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***DEFICIENT DOCUEMNT - PLEASE DISREGARD***NOTICE by Laura Annette Lowry, Bettye Wiley Neely, Aubrey Eugene Wiley re #10 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Withdrawal (Klein, Jason) Modified on 6/16/2020 (baf, ).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL submitted DOCUMENT #12 - A MOTION IS REQUIRED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Aubrey Eugene Wiley, Laura Annette Lowry, Bettye Wiley Neely. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is June 26, 2020. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 6/12/2020. (baf, )
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO ORDER #14 ***First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Laura Annette Lowry, Bettye Wiley Neely, Aubrey Eugene Wiley. (Klein, Jason) Modified on 6/18/2020 (baf, ).
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC, filed by Aubrey Eugene Wiley, Laura Annette Lowry, Bettye Wiley Neely.(Klein, Jason)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint; GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiffs' deadline to file an amended complaint is June 5, 2020. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is June 26, 2020. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 6/11/2020. (baf, )
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER submitted DOCUMENT #6 - DOCUMENT IS A TWO-PART DOCUMENT/MOTION - AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SHOULD BE FILED SEPARTELY. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint, Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Laura Annette Lowry, Bettye Wiley Neely, Aubrey Eugene Wiley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/9/2020) (baf, ).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO AMEND COMPLAINT submitted DOCUMENT #5 - A MOTION IS REQUIRED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC, filed by Aubrey Eugene Wiley, Laura Annette Lowry, Bettye Wiley Neely.(Klein, Jason) Modified on 6/10/2020 (baf, ).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***STIPULATION Joint by Laura Annette Lowry, Bettye Wiley Neely, Aubrey Eugene Wiley. (Klein, Jason) Modified on 6/8/2020 (baf, ).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 5/1/2020. (baf, )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC, filed by Aubrey Eugene Wiley, Laura Annette Lowry, Bettye Wiley Neely.(baf, )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wabtec US Rail, Inc., Corporate Parent Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation, Other Affiliate Vanguard Group Inc. for Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC. (McEntire, Sawnie)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC from 16th Judicial District Court of Denton County, Texas, case number 2020-20-3123-16. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7762677), filed by Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Local Rule 81 List, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McEntire, Sawnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiley , et al v. Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Individually Laura Annette Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: As Trustee Laura Annette Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettye Wiley Neely
Represented By: Jason Michael Klein
Represented By: Travis Lee Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Eugene Wiley
Represented By: Jason Michael Klein
Represented By: Travis Lee Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Annette Lowry
Represented By: Jason Michael Klein
Represented By: Travis Lee Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wabtec Manufacturing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Sawnie Aldredge McEntire
Represented By: Michael Andrew Walsh
Represented By: Alexandra Wales Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?