Cothran v. Koomson et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Cothran
Defendant: Abdul Koomson, Paul Ogbolu, Richard Kumah, Rayzbung Enterprises, Eugene Cheng, El Ray Auto Parts, Gwen Brower, Hinsa Yaye, Christian Hadah, Jacob Lavie, David Kusi, Wahab Yussif, Global Tire Services, Inc. and Abdoulaye Ahmed
Case Number: 4:2020cv00481
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION Leave of Court to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas Duces Tecum Prior to Service of Defendants by Brenda Cothran. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert G. Bernhoft, #2 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernhoft, Robert) (Attachment 8 replaced on 7/20/2020) (rpc, ).
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Gerald Bernhoft on behalf of Brenda Cothran (Bernhoft, Robert)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Plaintiff's Ex Parte MOTION for Leave of Court to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas Duces Tecum Prior to the Service of Any Defendant. ORDER this case and all pending motions are TRANSFERRED to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas. The referral of #8 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave of the Court to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for disposition is CANCELED. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
June 18, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #8 MOTION Ex Parte for Leave of Court to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas Duces Tecum Prior to the Service of Any Defendant (jv2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Notified Plaintiff's Attorney, Robert G. Bernhoft, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc, )
June 18, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
June 18, 2020 Note: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (rpc, )
May 18, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: referred #8 MOTION Ex Parte for Leave of Court to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas Duces Tecum Prior to the Service of Any Defendant. Referral Judge: Susan Hightower. (jv2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION Ex Parte for Leave of Court to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas Duces Tecum Prior to the Service of Any Defendant by Brenda Cothran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Bernhoft, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #8 Motion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that this motion is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic (tada) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Paul Ogbolu, Rayzbung Enterprises, Global Tire Services, Inc., Eugene Cheng, Jacob Lavie, Wahab Yussif, Christian Hadah, Richard Kumah, David Kusi, Abdoulaye Ahmed, Gwen Brower, Hinsa Yaye. (lt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brenda Cothran. (Bernhoft, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Abdul Koomson. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
March 20, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
March 20, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brenda Cothran. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brenda Cothran. (Bernhoft, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 3/23/2020) (cj). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt #0542-13370417), filed by Brenda Cothran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernhoft, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 3/23/2020) (cj). [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cothran v. Koomson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Koomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ogbolu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kumah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayzbung Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Ray Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwen Brower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinsa Yaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Hadah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Lavie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kusi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wahab Yussif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Tire Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdoulaye Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Cothran
Represented By: Robert Gerald Bernhoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?