Sampson v. U.S. Bank NA As Legal Title Trustee For Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Plaintiff: Reginald Sampson
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee For Truman 2016 Sc6 Title Trust, and U.S. Bank NA as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Case Number: 4:2020cv00493
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6), by U.S. Bank NA as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The Court sets this matter for a telephonic status conference on Tuesday, 11/24/2020, at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 8/7/2020. (baf, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 11/17/2020 for Plaintiff and by 12/1/2020 for Defendant. Discovery due by 2/9/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 10/6/2020. Mediation Completion due by 12/8/2020. Designation of Mediator due by 10/27/2020. Motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment, or other dispositive motions due by 12/15/2020. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 6/17/2021. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 8/7/2020. (baf, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that the Rule 16 management conference set for Tuesday, August 25, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 8/7/2020. (baf, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on 8/25/2020, at 2:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 8/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/1/2020. (baf, )
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/1/2020. (baf, )
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/30/2020. (baf, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 ***COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, INJUNCTION, PERMANENT INJUNCTION, AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURES FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank NA as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust, filed by Reginald Sampson.(baf, )
June 25, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 25, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee For Truman 2016 Sc6 Title Trust, (Cronenwett, Mark)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee For Truman 2016 Sc6 Title Trust, from District Court 471th Judicial District, Collin County, Texas, case number 471-02870-2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7861209), filed by U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee For Truman 2016 Sc6 Title Trust,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Pleadings filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Philip Danaher, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampson v. U.S. Bank NA As Legal Title Trustee For Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee For Truman 2016 Sc6 Title Trust,
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank NA as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Philip William Danaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Sampson
Represented By: Robert Clarence Newark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?