CoreClarity, Inc. v. Gallup, Inc.
Plaintiff: CoreClarity, Inc.
Defendant: Gallup, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00601
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 27 Amended MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by CoreClarity, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palter, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Palter, John)
September 14, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Gallup, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Lehv, #2 Exhibit A - Fross Zelnick August Invoice, #3 Exhibit B - Fross Zelnick September time sheet, #4 Exhibit Declaration of John Jackson, #5 Exhibit A - Jackson Walker August Invoice, #6 Exhibit B - Jackson Walker September Time, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
August 31, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by CoreClarity, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on CoreClarity, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice)(Palter, John)
August 30, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gallup, Inc..(Jackson, John)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff CoreClarity, Inc.'s Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #6 ) is DENIED at this time. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/28/2020. (rpc, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #20 Notice (Other) Gallup, Inc.'s Post-Hearing Memorandum Concerning CoreClarity, Inc.' Application for TRO filed by CoreClarity, Inc.. (Palter, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Gallup, Inc. re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Gallup's Post-hearing Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff CoreClarity, Inc.s Temporary Restraining Order Application. (Jackson, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Motion Hearing held on 8/17/2020 at 1:30 p.m. re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by CoreClarity, Inc. John Palter and Joshua Minton appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. John Jackson appeared in person for Defendant. Richard Lehv and Jessica Vosgerchian appeared via phone for Defendant. Court takes matter under advisement. Court adjourned at 2:47 p.m. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (kkc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and in Response to Supplemental Affidavit of Candace Fitzpatrick and Unsworn Declaration of Dr. Woodcock (Dkt. Nos. 15-17) filed by Gallup, Inc.. (Jackson, John)
August 17, 2020 Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits, and please place voluminous pleadings in three-ring binder(s). (tls)
August 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by CoreClarity, Inc. Unsworn Declaration of Dr. Robert Woodcock (Palter, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #15 Affidavit in Support.. (Palter, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support Supplemental Affidavit of Candace Fitzpatrick by CoreClarity, Inc.. (Palter, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by CoreClarity, Inc. of Filing of Supplemental Affidavit of Candace Fitzpatrick and the Unsworn Declaration of Dr. Robert Woodcock (Palter, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gallup, Inc. (Jackson, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gallup, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Kinloch Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Report, #3 Exhibit 2 - Color change explanation, #4 Exhibit 3 - Report, #5 Exhibit 4 - Changes document, #6 Lehv Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 - Lehv Correspondence, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear at TRO Hearing by Telephone. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/11/2020. (rpc, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at upcoming TRO Hearing by Gallup, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing on #6 Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, August 14, 2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/10/2020. (rpc, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard Lehv on behalf of Gallup, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt 0540-7933129. (jmv, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order .. (Palter, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by CoreClarity, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palter, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Jackson on behalf of Gallup, Inc. (Jackson, John)
August 7, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 7, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 7, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #3 Proposed Order submitted by CoreClarity, Inc. The exhibits were not filed as separate attachments and the proposed order was filed as a separate filing instead of being an exhibit to the Motion. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CoreClarity, Inc. (Palter, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Proposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Motion by CoreClarity, Inc.. (Palter, John) Modified on 8/7/2020 (rpc, ).
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by CoreClarity, Inc.. (Palter, John) Modified on 8/7/2020 (rpc, ).
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against Gallup, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7932168.), filed by CoreClarity, Inc..(Palter, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rpc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CoreClarity, Inc. v. Gallup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallup, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Lehv
Represented By: John M Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CoreClarity, Inc.
Represented By: John T Palter
Represented By: Gregory A Eyster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?