Frisco Sky, LLC et al v. Ervin Cable Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frisco Sky, LLC, Frisco Sun, LLC and Frisco Mon, LLC
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Ervin Cable Construction, Inc. and Ervin Cable Cnstruction, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00627
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AGREED ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT - GRANTING #7 Motion to Remand. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this action is REMANDED back to the 471st Judicial District Court, Collin County, Cause No. 471-03380-2020 for further proceedings. Court Costs, attorney's fees, and expenses incurred in connection with the proceedings before this Court are to be paid by the party incurring same. As this is an Agreed Order, the Clerk is directed to remand this case without delay. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/1/2020. (baf, )
October 1, 2020 REMAND letter, certified copy of ORDER Remanding #17 , and certified copy of docket sheet mailed to the 471st Judicial District Court, Collin County, Cause No. 471-3380-2020. (baf, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Enter Agreed Order by Ervin Cable Cnstruction, LLC, Ervin Cable Construction, Inc., Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Morris, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY - PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS A STAND ALONE DOCUMENT***Proposed Agreed Judgment To Remand To State Court. (Morris, Michael) Modified on 9/28/2020 (baf, ).
September 28, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY - PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS A STAND ALONE DOCUMENT. Document # 15, PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Ervin Cable Cnstruction, LLC, Ervin Cable Construction, Inc., Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC and Plaintiffs of Parties' Agreement (Morris, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 All Defendants' ANSWER to #3 Complaint, Plaintiff's 1st Amended Petition by Ervin Cable Cnstruction, LLC, Ervin Cable Construction, Inc., Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC.(Morris, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Disclosure of Interested Parties by Ervin Cable Cnstruction, LLC, Ervin Cable Construction, Inc., Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Morris, Michael)
September 25, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Ervin Cable Cnstruction, LLC, Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Morris, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/16/2020) (baf, ).
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Verizon Business Network Services, LLC and Verizon Wireless Services, LLC by Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Morris, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/15/2020) (baf, ).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/6/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 11:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/1/2020. (rpc, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC Defendants' Notice of Consent to Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Elder, Johnathan)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND by Frisco Mon, LLC, Frisco Sky, LLC, Frisco Sun, LLC. (Attachments: #1 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND)(Eghbal, Shahin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Remand PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND by Frisco Mon, LLC, Frisco Sky, LLC, Frisco Sun, LLC. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND)(Eghbal, Shahin) Modified on 8/31/2020 (baf, ).
August 31, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO REMAND submitted DOCUMENT #6 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER DOES NOT COMPLY WITH OUR LOCAL RULES. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Ervin Cable Construction, Inc. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/19/2020. (baf, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC.(daj, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 ***PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED PETITION FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Ervin Cable Cnstruction, LLC, Ervin Cable Construction, Inc., Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, filed by Frisco Mon, LLC, Frisco Sky, LLC, Frisco Sun, LLC.(daj, )
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, )
August 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ervin Cable Cnstruction, LLC. (Morris, Michael)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ervin Cable Construction, Inc. from 471st Judicial District Court of Collin County, Texas, case number 471-0380-2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7948727), filed by Ervin Cable Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit List of All Parties and Counsel, #3 Exhibit List of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Certified Copy of State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A-3 Plaintiff's 1st Amended Petition, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A-4 - Proof of Service on Ervin Cable, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A-5 Proof of Service on Verizon Business Network Services, LLC, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A-6 Proof of Service on Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, #10 Exhibit Exhibit A-7 Verizon Defendants' Answer and Demand for Jury)(Morris, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frisco Sky, LLC et al v. Ervin Cable Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
Represented By: Stephani R Johnson
Represented By: Johnathan Eric Elder
Represented By: Michael Patrick Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Business Network Services, LLC
Represented By: Stephani R Johnson
Represented By: Johnathan Eric Elder
Represented By: Michael Patrick Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ervin Cable Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Patrick Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ervin Cable Cnstruction, LLC
Represented By: Michael Patrick Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frisco Sky, LLC
Represented By: Shahin Eghbal
Represented By: Levi Glenn McCathern, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frisco Sun, LLC
Represented By: Shahin Eghbal
Represented By: Levi Glenn McCathern, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frisco Mon, LLC
Represented By: Shahin Eghbal
Represented By: Levi Glenn McCathern, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?