RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00628
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. to 10/26/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co..( Steinhaeuser, Lauren)
September 8, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. to 10/9/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Steinhaeuser on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (Steinhaeuser, Lauren)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co..( Carter, Richard)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Trevor Carter on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (Carter, Richard)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Burns, Ronald)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (rpc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Burns, Ronald)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC (Burns, Ronald)
August 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against State Farm Automobile Mutual Insurance Company, filed by RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burns, Ronald)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against State Farm Automobile Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7951428.), filed by RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Burns, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.
Represented By: Lauren Steinhaeuser
Represented By: Richard Trevor Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Ronald William Burns, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?