RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Plaintiff: RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc and Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00629
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Liberty Mutual Group Inc. to 10/23/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Liberty Mutual Group Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
September 8, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Liberty Mutual Group Inc. to 10/8/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Liberty Mutual Group Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC. Liberty Mutual Group Inc. served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Burns, Ronald)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Liberty Mutual Group Inc. (rpc, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Burns, Ronald)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC (Burns, Ronald)
August 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Liberty Mutual Group Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7951695.), filed by RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Burns, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RFC Lenders of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Ronald William Burns, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?