J.W. Logistics Operations, LLC v. Lenn Corporation
Plaintiff: J.W. Logistics Operations, LLC
Defendant: Lenn Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00630
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 The Court hereby CANCELS the 10/22/20 Scheduling Conference. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/13/2020. (baf, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Lenn Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Fox, Stephen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/6/2020) (baf, ).
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fox, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #7 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by J.W. Logistics Operations, LLC.(Stewart, William)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by J.W. Logistics Operations, LLC (Stewart, William)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against J.W. Logistics Operations, LLC by Lenn Corporation.(Fox, Stephen)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/6/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/1/2020. (rpc, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lenn Corporation, filed by J.W. Logistics Operations, LLC.(Stewart, William)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lenn Corporation. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/20/2020. (baf, )
August 18, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (las, )
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (las)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by Lenn Corporation.(las)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Lenn Corporation, filed by J.W. Logistics Operations, LLC.(las)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lenn Corporation from 471ST District Court, case number 471-03273-2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7951876), filed by Lenn Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Fox, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.W. Logistics Operations, LLC v. Lenn Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenn Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Edward Fox
Represented By: Jonathan Evan Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.W. Logistics Operations, LLC
Represented By: William Kelly Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?