Rovia, LLC v. Viva Voyage, LLC
Plaintiff: Rovia, LLC
Defendant: Viva Voyage, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00633
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rovia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Stephanie)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. The Court hereby sua sponte withdraws its Order (Dkt. #36 ) entered on October 13, 2020, as it was inadvertently entered in the wrong case. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/13/2020. (baf, )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - GRANTING #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #23 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AMENDED. Responses due by 10/20/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/13/2020. (baf, )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ***WITHDRAWAN PURSUANT TO ORDER #38 ***ORDER. Pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Chris McDonald (Dkt. #33 ). Plaintiffs did not file a response and shall file a response no later than October 20, 2020, or notify the Court there is no opposition. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/13/2020. (baf, ) Modified on 10/13/2020 (baf, ).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/9/2020. (rpc, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AMENDED filed by Rovia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Stephanie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AMENDED by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 31 BRIEF filed IN REPLY TO #24 BRIEF REGARDING THE FIRST-TO-FILE RULE by Rovia, LLC. (Barnes, Stephanie)
September 28, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #24 Brief filed by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Berger, Evan)
September 25, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rovia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Stephanie)
September 24, 2020 Filing 28 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #26 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Barnes, Stephanie)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - GRANTING #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Brief on the Applicability of the First to File Rule in Connection with this Action. Responses due by 9/28/2020. Replies due by 10/2/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/23/2020. (baf, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Rovia, LLC. (Barnes, Stephanie)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 Brief by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/23/2020) (baf, ).
September 18, 2020 Filing 24 BRIEF filed REGARDING THE FIRST-TO-FILE RULE by Rovia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Barnes, Stephanie)
September 18, 2020 Filing 23 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AMENDED by Rovia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order TRO, #3 Text of Proposed Order Preliminary Injunction)(Barnes, Stephanie)
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against Viva Voyage, LLC, filed by Rovia, LLC.(Barnes, Stephanie)
September 11, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/14/2020) (baf, ).
September 11, 2020 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: TRO Motion hearing called but not held on 9/11/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Stephanie Barnes and Court Smith appeared in person. Eric Haynes and Lisa Harig appeared via telephone. Evan Berger appeared via phone. Parties will submit briefing. Call adjourned at 9:26 a.m. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (kkc, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Continue the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order which is set for hearing on Friday, September 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. (Dkt. 10) filed by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Berger, Evan)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - GRANTING #16 Unopposed MOTION to Remotely Appear for the Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order set for September 11, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. re #10 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, filed by Viva Voyage, LLC. Telephonic Conference on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is set for 9/11/2020 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Counsel for both Plaintiff and Defendant, as well as any client representatives, may appear via telephone, if desired, and call-in information is as follows: Participants are instructed to call the Conference Number at 8:55 AM: 888-363-4749 Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/10/2020. (baf, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Continue the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order which is set for hearing on Friday, September 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. (Dkt. 10) filed by Rovia, LLC. (Barnes, Stephanie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Remotely Appear for the Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order set for September 11, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. re #10 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/10/2020) (baf, ).
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order which is set for hearing on Friday, September 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. (Dkt. 10) by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/10/2020) (baf, ).
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Change Venue by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit Exhibit "E", #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan) (Attachment 6 replaced on 9/10/2020) (baf, ).
September 9, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO TRANSFER submitted DOCUMENT #13 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE, THE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IS NOT SIGNED AND THE PROPOSED ORDER DOES NOT COMPLY WITH OUR LOCAL RULE CV-7(a). Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Change Venue by Viva Voyage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit Exhibit "E", #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Evan) Modified on 9/9/2020 (baf, ).
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Rovia, LLC re #10 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barnes, Stephanie)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rovia, LLC. Viva Voyage, LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Barnes, Stephanie)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING HEARING. The Court hereby sets the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #4 for hearing on Friday, 9/11/2020, at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/24/2020. (baf, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 REDACTION to #4 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support by Rovia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, #5 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Barnes, Stephanie)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Viva Voyage, LLC. (baf, )
August 20, 2020 Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits, and please place voluminous pleadings in three-ring binder(s). (tls)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document - AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET: #1 Complaint.. (Barnes, Stephanie)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Viva Voyage, LLC. (baf, )
August 20, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
August 19, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by Rovia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Protective Order)(Barnes, Stephanie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Emergency SEALED MOTION For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support by Rovia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Barnes, Stephanie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Opposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Rovia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Stephanie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rovia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Worldventures Holdings, LLC for Rovia, LLC. (Barnes, Stephanie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against Viva Voyage, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7956420.), filed by Rovia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rovia, LLC v. Viva Voyage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viva Voyage, LLC
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rovia, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Rene' Barnes
Represented By: Court Dean Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?