Gregg v. U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Cabana Series III Trust
Appellant: Brian Charles Gregg
Appellee: U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Cabana Series III Trust
Trustee: Carey D Ebert
Case Number: 4:2020cv00634
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Appellant Brief due by 11/14/2020. Appellee shall serve and file a brief in this case no later than 14 days after service of the brief of appellant. Appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the brief of the appellee.(daj, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 Appellee's BRIEF by U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Cabana Series III Trust. Appellant Reply Brief due by 10/28/2020. (Anderson, Richard)
September 30, 2020 Filing 19 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal - Part 3 Transmitted to District Court.INCOMPLETE RECORD Filed (Transcript Has Not been Received.. (ldc, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal - Part 2 Transmitted to District Court.INCOMPLETE RECORD Filed (Transcript has not been received). (ldc, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal- Part 1 Transmitted to District Court.INCOMPLETE RECORD Filed (Transcript has not been received). (ldc, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 Appellee's Statement of Issues and Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal by U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Cabana Series III Trust re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. (ldc, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 Apellant's Statement of Issues by Brian Charles Gregg re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. (ldc, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Brian Charles Gregg re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. (ldc, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 Amended Bankruptcy Cover Sheet (Reflecting Payment of Fee for Notice of Appeal): #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,.. (ldc, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #3 Motion to Extend Stay of Bankruptcy Court Orders Pending Debtor's Appeal to District Court,. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/22/2020. (daj, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 EMERGENCY THIRD SUPPLEMENT to Debtor's #3 MOTION to Extend Stay of Bankruptcy Orders Pending Debtor's Appeal to District Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(daj, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 EMERGENCY SECOND SUPPLEMENT to Debtor's #3 MOTION to Extend Stay of Bankruptcy Orders Pending Debtor's Appeal to District Court.. (Attachments: #1 Index to Appendix, #2 Appendix I, #3 Appendix II, #4 Appendix III.1, #5 Appendix III.2, #6 Appendix IV, #7 Appendix IV.2, #8 Appendix IV.3, #9 Appendix V, #10 Appendix VI)(daj, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 Additional Attachments to Main Document filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Cabana Series III Trust. (Anderson, Richard)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Extend Stay of Bankruptcy Orders Pending Debtor's Appeal to District Court filed by Brian Charles Gregg. (daj, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 EMERGENCY SUPPLEMENT to Debtor's #3 MOTION to Extend Stay of Bankruptcy Orders Pending Debtor's Appeal to District Court. (daj, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Brian Charles Gregg. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(daj, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Extend Stay of Bankruptcy Orders Pending Debtor's Appeal to District Court filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Cabana Series III Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Richard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Ernest Anderson on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Cabana Series III Trust (Anderson, Richard)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Debtor's MOTION to Extend Stay of Bankruptcy Orders Pending Debtor's Appeal to District Court, by Brian Charles Gregg. (kls, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (daj, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BK20-40867. File received via email from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Brian Charles Gregg. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Cover Sheet, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #3 Bankruptcy Order on Appeal)(daj, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/2/2020) (daj, ).
August 20, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to appellant. (daj, )
August 20, 2020 Electronic case file is in Bankruptcy Court. Please refer to the Bankruptcy Pacer site @ https://ecf.txeb.uscourts.gov to view/retrieve the record. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregg v. U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Cabana Series III Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Brian Charles Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Cabana Series III Trust
Represented By: Richard Ernest Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Carey D Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?