806 Technologies, Inc. v. Document Tracking Service, LLC
Plaintiff: 806 Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Docket Tracking Service LLC and Document Tracking Service, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00677
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendant Document Tracking Service, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3), (Dkt. #7 ), is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 11/6/2020. (rpc, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Document Tracking Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit/Declaration of Brendan Boyd in Support, #2 Affidavit Affidavit/Declaration of Caitlin Jones in Support, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Caitlin Jones in Support, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Caitlin Jones in Support, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Jones, Caitlin) (Attachment 5 replaced on 11/5/2020) (baf, ).
November 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State Claim by Document Tracking Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jones, Caitlin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/5/2020) (baf, ).
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. This case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Wednesday, 12/11/2020, at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan.) Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 11/24/2020. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/20/2020. (baf, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 806 Technologies, Inc., filed by 806 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mongogna, John)
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Document Tracking Service, LLC. (Jones, Caitlin)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - DENYING AS MOOT #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3). Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/5/2020. (baf, )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff 806 Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Pending Ruling on Motion to Remand, (Dkt. #13 ), is DENIED without prejudice to refiling if and when Plaintiff files a motion to remand. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/2/2020. (baf, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by 806 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)2 and 12(b)(3), #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Ross Laughter, #3 Exhibit 1-A, #4 Exhibit 1-B, #5 Exhibit 1-C, #6 Exhibit 1-D, #7 Exhibit 1-E, #8 Exhibit 1-F)(Mongogna, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 Opposed MOTION to Stay Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)2 and 12(b)(3) Pending Ruling on Motion to Remand by 806 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mongogna, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)2 and 12(b)(3) by 806 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mongogna, John)
September 30, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO STAY AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESOND submitted DOCUMENT #11 - DOCUMENT IS A TWO-PART MOTION. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)2 and 12(b)(3) by 806 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mongogna, John) Modified on 9/30/2020 (baf, ).
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #6 Notice of Removal, #1 Notice of Removal,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Original Petition State Court, #2 Exhibit 2 Civil Citation, #3 Exhibit 3 Service Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 Notice of Removal Filing, #5 Exhibit 5 Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit 6 Exhibits to Notice of Removal)(Hemingway, D)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/17/2020. (baf, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer.. (Hemingway, D)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Document Tracking Service, LLC. (Hemingway, D) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Document Tracking Service, LLC (Supplemental Amended Notice of Removal) from 416th Judicial Dist Court of Collin County Texas, case number 416-03962-2020., filed by Document Tracking Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 7 to Support Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 8 in Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 8A to 8D in Support of Notice of Removal)(Hemingway, D)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON JURISDICTIONAL PLEADING. The Court ORDERS that, by no later than September 29, 2020, Defendant Document Tracking Service, LLC must file an amended notice of removal that alleges facts sufficient to invoke this Court's jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/15/2020. (baf, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Caitlin M Jones on behalf of Document Tracking Service, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8001128. (Jones, Caitlin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Douglas A. Pettit on behalf of Document Tracking Service, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8001072. (Pettit, Douglas)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Docket Tracking Service LLC, filed by 806 Technologies, Inc..(baf, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Document Tracking Service, LLC from 416th Judicial District Court, Collin County Texas, case number 416-03962-2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7994474), filed by Document Tracking Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 7, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hemingway, D) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #3 Exhibit 1 - Stae Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 2 - State Court Citations, #5 Exhibt 3 - Complaint filed in State Court, #6 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Brendan Boyd in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal) (baf, ).
September 10, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
September 10, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 806 Technologies, Inc. v. Document Tracking Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 806 Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: John Joseph Mongogna
Represented By: William Todd Albin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Docket Tracking Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Document Tracking Service, LLC
Represented By: D Scott Hemingway
Represented By: Caitlin M Jones
Represented By: Douglas A. Pettit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?