Cunningham v. UltimateVita, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: Ariel Cortes, UltimateVita, LLC and Jessica Cortes
Case Number: 4:2020cv00738
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UltimateVita, LLC (Gold, Jacob)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), (b)(2), (b)(6)) by Ariel Cortes, Jessica Cortes, UltimateVita, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ariel Cortes, #2 Declaration of Jessica Cortes, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal (Subject Matter Jurisdiction), #4 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal (Personal Jurisdiction), #5 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal (Failure to State a Claim))(Gold, Jacob)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Craig Cunningham's Complaint [Dkt. 1] is extended to Thursday, November 26, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/28/2020. (daj, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ariel Cortes, Jessica Cortes, UltimateVita, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Gold, Jacob)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Ariel Cortes, Jessica Cortes, UltimateVita, LLC re #9 Notice of Attorney Appearance (Amended Certificate of Service) (Gold, Jacob)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Michael Gold on behalf of All Defendants (Gold, Jacob)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. UltimateVita, LLC served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (daj, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Jessica Cortes served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (daj, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Ariel Cortes served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (daj, )
October 7, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 6-54372 (gsg)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Jessica Cortes. (daj, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Ariel Cortes. (daj, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to UltimateVita, LLC. (daj, )
September 29, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to Plf. (daj, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ariel Cortes, Jessica Cortes, UltimateVita, LLC, filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. UltimateVita, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariel Cortes
Represented By: Jacob Michael Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UltimateVita, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Michael Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Cortes
Represented By: Jacob Michael Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?