Cunningham v. Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: Sing for Service, LLC, dba MEPCO, Jeff Rosenthal, Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc., Voluntary Benefit Specialists, LLC dba Quick Fix Auto Protection and Brickell Financial Services-Motor Club, Inc., dba Road America Motor Club
Case Number: 4:2020cv00739
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Craig Cunningham as to #13 Order. (rpc, )
November 20, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc. to 12/20/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc.. (Whitfield, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff Craig Cunningham shall file a brief that specifically addresses Barr v. American Association of Political Consultants, Inc. and the Court's subject matter jurisdiction no later than Wednesday, December 9, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/18/2020. (daj, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file an Application for Extension of Time if any such extension of time to file an answer is requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/16/2020. (daj, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Sing for Service, LLC, dba MEPCO waiver sent on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (daj, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Brickell Financial and Matrix Warranty Solutions), by Craig Cunningham. (rpc, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jeff Rosenthal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(daj, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Brickell Financial Services-Motor Club, Inc., dba Road America Motor Club served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (rpc, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Jeff Rosenthal served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (rpc, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc. (Matrix Financial Services, LLC) served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (rpc, )
October 7, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 01189 (gsg)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Sing for Service, LLC, dba MEPCO. (daj, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc.. (daj, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Jeff Rosenthal. (daj, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Brickell Financial Services-Motor Club, Inc., dba Road America Motor Club. (daj, )
September 29, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to Plf. (daj, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc., Jeff Rosenthal, Sing for Service, LLC, dba MEPCO, Voluntary Benefit Specialists, LLC dba Quick Fix Auto Protection, filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sing for Service, LLC, dba MEPCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Eric Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voluntary Benefit Specialists, LLC dba Quick Fix Auto Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brickell Financial Services-Motor Club, Inc., dba Road America Motor Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?