CVE Technology Group, Inc. v. Cho et al
Plaintiff: CVE Technology, Inc. and CVE Technology Group, Inc.
Defendant: 3000 E. Plano Parkway Property LLC, Kyuk Taek "Edwa Cho and Kyuk Taek "Edward" Cho
Case Number: 4:2020cv00752
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVE Technology Group, Inc.. (Sbaiti, Mazin)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVE Technology Group, Inc.. 3000 E. Plano Parkway Property LLC served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Sbaiti, Mazin) Modified on 10/22/2020 (rpc, ).
October 22, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 6, SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVE Technology Group, Inc.. 3000 E. Plano Parkway Property LLC. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rpc, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVE Technology Group, Inc.. CVE Technology Group, Inc. served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Sbaiti, Mazin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Original Complaint served on Kyuk Taek "Edward" Cho on 10/5/2020, filed by CVE Technology Group, Inc.. (Sbaiti, Mazin) Modified on 10/21/2020 (rpc, ).
October 21, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Original Complaint served on Kyuk Taek "Edward" Cho submitted by CVE Technology Group, Inc.. The document should be filed using event Summons Returned Executed. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to 3000 E. Plano Parkway Property LLC. (rpc, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Kyuk Taek "Edward" Cho. (rpc, )
October 1, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
October 1, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8033927.), filed by CVE Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sbaiti, Mazin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CVE Technology Group, Inc. v. Cho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3000 E. Plano Parkway Property LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyuk Taek "Edwa Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyuk Taek "Edward" Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVE Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVE Technology Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Represented By: Bradford J. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?