Transplace Texas, LP v. Independent Transport, LLC
Plaintiff: Transplace Texas, LP
Defendant: Independent Transport, LLC doing business as Independent Pallets
Counter Claimant: Independent Transport, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00788
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Transplace Texas, LP by Independent Transport, LLC.(Zoldan, Kenneth)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth J Zoldan on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8132429. (Zoldan, Kenneth)
November 30, 2020 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Independent Transport, LLC to 12/10/2020. (rpc, )
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 11/30/2020. (rpc, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Independent Transport, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A--Local Form UAET (02-2008), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ponder, Bernard)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Independent Transport, LLC. (rpc, )
October 13, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 13, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Independent Transport, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8050458.), filed by Transplace Texas, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beck, Jesse) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (rpc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transplace Texas, LP v. Independent Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transplace Texas, LP
Represented By: Jesse Franklin Beck
Represented By: Marianne E Laine
Represented By: David Earl James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Transport, LLC doing business as Independent Pallets
Represented By: Bernard Weldon Ponder, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth J Zoldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Independent Transport, LLC
Represented By: Bernard Weldon Ponder, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth J Zoldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?