Bidwell v. Commissioner, SSA
Plaintiff: Joe Bidwell
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul and Commissioner, SSA
Case Number: 4:2020cv00860
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner, SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, forwarded to USMS for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(daj, )
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/6/2020. (daj, )
November 5, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
November 5, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (daj, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Joe Bidwell Certificate of Interested Persons (Kelly, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joe Bidwell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner, SSA, filed by Joe Bidwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Michael) Modified on 11/5/2020 (daj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bidwell v. Commissioner, SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Bidwell
Represented By: Michael Thomas Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?