Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 108.73.19.68
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holding, LLC and Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 108 and John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 108
Case Number: 4:2021cv00244
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 4:21cv243, designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings are to be filed in the Lead Case. (mcg)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 4:21-CV-243. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the lead case. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/8/2021. (mcg)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Seger, Forrest)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Seger, Forrest)
March 30, 2021 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement: INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (mcg)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE - PLEASE IGNORE***Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Seger, Forrest) Modified on 3/30/2021 (mcg, ).
March 29, 2021 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement: INCORRECT PARTY NAME CONTAINED IN THE CASE CAPTION. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY. (mcg)
March 26, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg)
March 26, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mcg)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seger, Forrest)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE - PLEASE IGNORE***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holding, LLC. (Seger, Forrest) Modified on 3/29/2021 (mcg, ).
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8323332.), filed by Strike 3 Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seger, Forrest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 108.73.19.68
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holding, LLC
Represented By: Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 108
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 108
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?