Qualinfotech Solutions, Inc. et al v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al
Plaintiff: Qualinfotech Solutions, Inc. and Vijay Kumar Appana
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirt Thompson, Tracy Renaud and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 4:2021cv00323
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Richard A Schell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1156
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Richard A. Schell, effective immediately. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/4/2021. (mcg)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 ***FILING ERROR - PLEASE IGNORE - PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS SEPARATE ENTRY***Proposed Agreed Judgment . (Chen, Alan) Modified on 6/2/2021 (mcg, ).
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Vijay Kumar Appana, Qualinfotech Solutions, Inc.. (Chen, Alan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mcg, ).
June 2, 2021 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #6 PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS SEPARATE ENTRY. (mcg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kirt Thompson. (mcg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tracy Renaud. (mcg)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(mcg)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8373141.), filed by Qualinfotech Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chen, Alan)
April 22, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mcg)
April 22, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qualinfotech Solutions, Inc. et al v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qualinfotech Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Chung Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vijay Kumar Appana
Represented By: Alan Chung Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirt Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?