United States of America v. 369 Sweet Bay Avenue, Plantation, Florida, 33324, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 3535 S. Ocean Drive, Unit 2901, Hollywood, Florida, 33019, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon, 366 Sweet Bay Avenue, Plantation, Florida, 33324, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon, 369 Sweet Bay Avenue, Plantation, Florida, 33324, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon and 3843 Oak Ridge Circle, Weston, Florida, 33331, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon
Case Number: 4:2021cv00325
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 16 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #14 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McClendon, J)
June 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Seal Document affidavit by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClendon, J)
June 22, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(McClendon, J)
May 28, 2021 Filing 13 CLAIM Verified by 3843 Oak Ridge Circle, Weston, Florida, 33331, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon. (Rosenberg, Daniel)
May 28, 2021 Filing 12 CLAIM Verified by 3535 S. Ocean Drive, Unit 2901, Hollywood, Florida, 33019, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon. (Rosenberg, Daniel)
May 28, 2021 Filing 11 CLAIM Verified by 366 Sweet Bay Avenue, Plantation, Florida, 33324, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon. (Rosenberg, Daniel)
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 CLAIM Verified by 369 Sweet Bay Avenue, Plantation, Florida, 33324, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon. (Rosenberg, Daniel)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay Civil Forfeiture Case pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 981(g). It is therefore ORDERED that the instant civil forfeiture proceeding is STAYED pending resolution of the related criminal investigation involving the property in this civil forfeiture action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 5/26/2021. (mem)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal the Affidavit Supporting the Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem re #3 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 5/26/2021. (mem)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Rosenberg on behalf of 3535 S. Ocean Drive, Unit 2901, Hollywood, Florida, 33019, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon, 366 Sweet Bay Avenue, Plantation, Florida, 33324, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon, 369 Sweet Bay Avenue, Plantation, Florida, 33324, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon, 3843 Oak Ridge Circle, Weston, Florida, 33331, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8427085. (Rosenberg, Daniel)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION to Stay by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClendon, J)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REFERRAL ORDER: Case referred to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/29/2021. (mem) Modified text on 4/30/2021 (mem).
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document #1 Complaint: Affidavit Supporting the Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McClendon, J) Modified text on 4/23/2021 (mem).
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document Affidavit by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClendon, J)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McClendon, J)
April 23, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mem)
April 23, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mem, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 369 Sweet Bay Avenue, Plantation, Florida, 33324, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3535 S. Ocean Drive, Unit 2901, Hollywood, Florida, 33019, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon
Represented By: Daniel Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 366 Sweet Bay Avenue, Plantation, Florida, 33324, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon
Represented By: Daniel Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 369 Sweet Bay Avenue, Plantation, Florida, 33324, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon
Represented By: Daniel Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3843 Oak Ridge Circle, Weston, Florida, 33331, Including All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements Thereon
Represented By: Daniel Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: J Kevin McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?