Thompson v. Pruett et al
Plaintiff: Randal Lee Thompson
Defendant: Jeffrey Pruett, James Edland, Sheena Molsbee and Paul Johnson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00371
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION filed by Paul Johnson, Sheena Molsbee. (Shovlin, Matthew)
June 24, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Edland, Jeffrey Pruett. (Davis, Robert)
June 22, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randal Lee Thompson. Sheena Molsbee served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (rpc, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randal Lee Thompson. Paul Johnson served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (rpc, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randal Lee Thompson. James Edland served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (rpc, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randal Lee Thompson. Jeffrey Pruett served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. (rpc, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss and #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Randal Lee Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(rpc, ) Modified on 6/21/2021 (rpc, ).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Stay Discovery and Abatement of Any Order for Rule 26 Conference Pending Determination of Their Motion to Dismiss and Asserted Immunities. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 6/7/2021. (rpc, )
June 4, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Paul Johnson, Sheena Molsbee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stay)(Shovlin, Matthew)
June 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Paul Johnson, Sheena Molsbee Notice of Designation of Lead Counsel (Shovlin, Matthew)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay Discovery and Abatement of Any Order for Rule 26 Conference Pending Determination of Motion to Dismiss and Asserted Immunity. IT IS ORDERED that all discovery, Rule 26 conference requirements, and scheduling requirements are STAYED pending resolution of Pruett and Edland's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #11 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 6/4/2021. (rpc, )
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Paul Johnson, Sheena Molsbee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit for Probable Cause, #2 Exhibit True Bill of Indictment, #3 Exhibit Motion and Order to Dismiss, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Feldt, John)
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay discovery pending resolution of immunity by James Edland, Jeffrey Pruett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by James Edland, Jeffrey Pruett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PC Affidavit (CS), #2 Exhibit Magistrate PC determination, #3 Exhibit Order of Commitment (CS), #4 Exhibit Indictment, #5 Exhibit PC Affidavit (DL), #6 Exhibit Order of Commitment (DL), #7 Exhibit Register of Actions, #8 Exhibit State Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit Order to Dismiss, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Randal Lee Thompson as to #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (mcg)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Sheena Molsbee and forwarded along with the USM-285 to the US Marshal for service. (rpc, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Paul Johnson and forwarded along with the USM-285 to the US Marshal for service. (rpc, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to James Edland and forwarded along with the USM-285 to the US Marshal for service. (rpc, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Jeffrey Pruett and forwarded along with the USM-285 to the US Marshal for service. (rpc, )
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/17/2021. (rpc, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (rpc, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randal Lee Thompson. (rpc, )
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Edland, Paul Johnson, Sheena Molsbee, Jeffrey Pruett, filed by Randal Lee Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rpc, )
May 14, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Pruett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Pruett
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Edland
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheena Molsbee
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Shovlin
Represented By: John Joseph Feldt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Shovlin
Represented By: John Joseph Feldt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Lee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?