Hall v. Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Hall
Defendant: FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH, Target Corporation, Witron Logistik + Informatik GmbH doing business as Witron Logistik + Informatik GmbH Corp. and Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00477
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - granting #20 Motion for an Order to Appoint Special Process Service. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/12/2021. (baf, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION Order to Appoint Special Process Service Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for an Order to Appoint Special Process Service by Danielle Hall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clement, Todd) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/10/2021) (baf, ).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/9/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/5/2021. (rpc, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Danielle Hall Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties (Clement, Todd)
July 28, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc., Witron Logistik Informatik GmbH Certificate of Interested Parties (McFarland, David)
July 28, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc., Witron Logistik Informatik GmbH (McFarland, David)
July 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Target Corporation Certificate of Financially Interested Parties (Williamson, Kent)
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation (Williamson, Kent)
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 Target Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint by Target Corporation.(Williamson, Kent)
July 21, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 12 ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Plaintiff by Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc., Witron Logistik Informatik GmbH.(McFarland, David)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Hall. Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc. served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Clement, Todd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Hall. Witron Logistik Informatik GmbH served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Clement, Todd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Hall. Target Corporation served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (Clement, Todd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Hall. FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Clement, Todd)
July 1, 2021 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons to FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH served on Texas Secretary of State submitted by Danielle Hall. The Executed Summons should be filed using event Summons Returned Executed. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons to FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH served on Texas Secretary of State on 06/24/2021, filed by Danielle Hall. (Clement, Todd) Modified on 7/1/2021 (rpc, ).
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Witron Logistik Informatik GmbH. (baf, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Target Corporation. (baf, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH (TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE). (baf, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (baf, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH. (baf, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8467506.), filed by Danielle Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clement, Todd)
June 23, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
June 23, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Kent D Williamson
Represented By: Mark Trammell Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witron Logistik + Informatik GmbH doing business as Witron Logistik + Informatik GmbH Corp.
Represented By: David Adair McFarland
Represented By: Stephen C Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: David Adair McFarland
Represented By: Stephen C Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Hall
Represented By: Todd Clement
Represented By: Shawn Saeed Hashemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?