Mann v. Commissioner of SSA
Plaintiff: Mendi Mann
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA and Commissioner, SSA
Case Number: 4:2021cv00489
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mendi Mann. Commissioner, SSA served on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Kelly, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner, SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, forwarded to USM for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(daj, )
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 7/1/2021. (daj, )
June 29, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 29, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Mendi Mann Certificate of Interested Persons (Kelly, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mendi Mann. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA, filed by Mendi Mann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann v. Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mendi Mann
Represented By: Michael Thomas Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?