Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 99.41.250.10
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 99.41.250.10
Case Number: 4:2021cv00499
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED CONSOLIDATION ORDER. It is ORDERED that the following actions are now CONSOLIDATED as part of action numbered 4:21-CV-243: 4:21-CV-491, 4:21-CV-495, 4:21-CV-496, 4:21-CV-497, 4:21-CV-498, 4:21-CV-499, and 4:21-CV-500. It is further ORDERED that the parties in these newly consolidated cases are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the lead case (4:21-CV-243). With these modifications, the consolidation order, (4:21-CV-243, Dkt. #5 ), remains in effect. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 7/19/2021. (mcg)
July 19, 2021 This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 4:21cv243, designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings are to be filed in the Lead Case. (mcg)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Seger, Forrest)
June 30, 2021 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE OF FILING OF COPYRIGHT FORM - submitted DOCUMENTS #2 AND #4 - THE DOCUMENTS ARE INCOMPLETE AND SHOULD BE FILED TOGETHER AS ONE DOCUMENT WITH EXHIBIT AS AN ATTACHMENT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
June 29, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 29, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #2 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121) Exhibit A (Seger, Forrest) Modified on 6/30/2021 (baf, ).
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Seger, Forrest)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Seger, Forrest) Modified on 6/30/2021 (baf, ).
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement - Demand for Jury Trial against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 99.41.250.10 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8475988.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seger, Forrest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 99.41.250.10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 99.41.250.10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?