Pryor v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Michael Arbary Pryor
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 4:2021cv00570
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. ORDERED Petitioner has fourteen days to respond as to the timeliness of his petition. He is placed on notice that his 2254 petition may be dismissed if he fails to timely comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 8/24/2021. (daj, )
August 23, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 6-57851 (wea, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Michael Arbary Pryor as to #3 Order. (daj, )
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. ORDERED that Petitioner has thirty days from the receipt of this Order to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis, together with an in forma pauperis data sheet. ORDERED that the Clerk shall not accept any other documents in this case, except for a motion for an extension of time, until Petitioner complies with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/22/2021. (daj, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (397th Judicial District, Grayson County, Texas No. 066728-A), filed by Michael Arbary Pryor. (FEE NOT PAID) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope(s))(daj, )
July 21, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to petitioner. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pryor v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Arbary Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?