Allred v. Collin County
Plaintiff: Sheri Denise Allred
Defendant: Collin County
Case Number: 4:2021cv00623
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Document #6 sent to Sheri Denise Allred returned marked "RETURN TO SENDER - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD" (mcg)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 Case reassigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-01797. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER: Case transferred to Sherman Division Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/9/2021) (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/9/2021.]
August 9, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Aug 9 08:50:15 CDT 2021 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/9/2021.]
August 9, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to Plf. (daj, )
August 5, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu Aug 5 08:26:54 CDT 2021 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/9/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Collin County filed by Sheri Denise Allred. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s)) (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/9/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/9/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allred v. Collin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Denise Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?