Duran v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: David Duran
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 4:2021cv00653
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 s
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by David Duran as to #3 Order. (mcg)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Compassionate Release Under 18 U.S.C 382(c)(1)(A) by David Duran. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(mcg)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send a standard 2241 form to Petitioner along with this Order. It is also ORDERED Petitioner has thirty days from the receipt of this Order to complete the 2241 form fully and legibly, and to submit it to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 8/23/2021. (mcg)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 (Construed) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by David Duran. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope(s))(daj, )
August 18, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to petitioner. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?