Moses et al v. Cantu et al
Plaintiff: John Moss, Donna Moss, John Moses and Donna Moses
Defendant: Victor Cantu and Jayme Cantu
Case Number: 4:2021cv00688
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
2 Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 23 Sur-Rely to Reply to RESPONSE to #7 Order, filed by Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu. (baf, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #15 Order, filed by Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D)(baf, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(baf, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with #15 Order and #16 Order by Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(rpc, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Temporary Injunction (Refiled With Both Defendants' Signatures) by Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu. Originally filed as #5 Motion. (rpc, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Electronic Filing and Correspondence (Refiled With Both Defendants' Signatures). Originally filed as #4 MOTION. by Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu. (rpc, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Refiled With Both Defendants' Signatures) by Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu. Originally filed as #1 Notice of Removal. (rpc, )
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. Pending before the Court is Plaintiffs John Moses and Donna Moses's Motion to Remand and Supporting Brief [Dkt. 8]. Pro se Defendants Victor Cantu and Jayme Cantu shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand [Dkt. 8], if at all, no later than Monday, October 4, 2021, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 9/22/2021. (baf, )
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Victor Cantu and Defendant Jayme Cantu must each personally sign any pleadings filed on their behalf. Defendants shall refile, if at all, any pleadings which do not comply with Rule 11 on or before Monday, October 4, 2021, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 9/22/2021. (baf, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Donna Moses, John Moses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit E-filing notice-counterclaim rejection, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Email from J. Cantu to S. Grigg, #6 Exhibit Email regarding Commission on Judicial Conduct, #7 Exhibit Email from S. Grigg, #8 Exhibit Notice to Court requesting cancellation of hearing)(Cook, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Donna Moses, John Moses. (Cook, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2021 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the REPLY submitted DOCUMENT #13 - ALL OF THE EXHIBITS ARE WITHIN THE MAIN DOCUMENT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Victor Cantu as to #7 Order. (baf, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Jayme Cantu as to #7 Order. (baf, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 Order, filed by Jayme Cantu. (baf, )
September 17, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR - PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS A STAND ALONE DOCUMENT. Document # 9, PROPOSED ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS A STAND ALONE DOCUMENT***Proposed Pretrial Order to Remand by Donna Moses, John Moses. (Cook, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Donna Moses, John Moses. (Cook, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that no later than Friday, September 17, 2021, Defendants must (1) inform the Court of the dates, if any, of the forthcoming or past eviction, or (2) notify the Court that Defendants no longer request injunctive relief. If Defendants fail to comply with this Order, the Court will recommend denying the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 09/03/2021. (las)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/3/2021. (baf, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED WITH BOTH SIGNATURES*** MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Jayme Cantu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(baf, ) Modified on 10/4/2021 (rpc, ).
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED WITH BOTH SIGNATURES*** MOTION for Electronic Filing and Correspondence by Jayme Cantu. (baf, ) Modified on 10/4/2021 (rpc, ).
September 1, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 ***ANSWER FILED IN COLLIN COUNTY JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu.(baf, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN COLLIN COUNTY JUSTICE OF THE PEACE COURT***COMPLAINT against Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu, filed by John Moss, Donna Moss.(baf, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu from Collin County Justice Court, Precinct 3, Place 1 Collin County, TX, case number 31-EV-21-01069. (Filing fee $ 402;RECEIPT #01208), filed by Jayme Cantu, Victor Cantu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses et al v. Cantu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Moss
Represented By: Adam Raymond Barela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Moss
Represented By: Adam Raymond Barela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Moses
Represented By: Adam Raymond Barela
Represented By: Jeffrey Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Moses
Represented By: Adam Raymond Barela
Represented By: Jeffrey Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayme Cantu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?