Mauala v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aliitasi Maula and Aliitasi Mauala
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00734
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 management conference set for 1/4/2022 at 2:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 12/10/2021. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/2/2021. (baf, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tyson Foods, Inc..(Mayer, Zachary)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Tyson Foods, Inc.. (mem)
September 23, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg)
September 23, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mcg)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint against Tyson Foods, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8596680.), filed by Aliitasi Maula. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/23/2021 with flattened image) (mcg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mauala v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliitasi Maula
Represented By: Vuk S Vujasinovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliitasi Mauala
Represented By: Joseph Borden Tennant
Represented By: Vuk S Vujasinovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Mayer
Represented By: Gerardo Adrian Galvan
Represented By: Joseph Edward Johnson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?