Page v. Commissioner, SSA
Plaintiff: Brandy Michelle Page
Defendant: Commissioner, SSA
Case Number: 4:2021cv00753
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandy Michelle Page. Commissioner, SSA (OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL, REGION VI SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION) served on 11/16/2021, answer due 1/15/2022. (baf, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandy Michelle Page. Commissioner, SSA (US ATTORNEY GENERAL) served on 11/3/2021, answer due 1/2/2022. (baf, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandy Michelle Page. Commissioner, SSA (US ATTORNEY)served on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (baf, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner, SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded along with the USM-285 to the US Marshal for service (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(mcg) Modified text on 10/15/2021 (mcg).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall prepare service of process on Defendant in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas within thirty (30) days of receiving this Order. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue process and the United States Marshal shall serve process upon Defendant within thirty (30) days of receiving completed process from the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/6/2021. (rpc, )
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandy Michelle Page. (Skaar, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY COMMISSIONER, filed by Brandy Michelle Page. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Skaar, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg)
September 29, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (mcg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Commissioner, SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Michelle Page
Represented By: Daniel Allan Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?