Truist Bank v. Donovan et al
Plaintiff: Truist Bank
Defendant: Brian K. Donovan and Elizabeth A. Donovan
Case Number: 4:2021cv00806
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Tule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Status Report by Truist Bank. (Clem, David) Modified text on 12/3/2021 (mem).
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILD IN INCORRECT CASE***STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Truist Bank. (Clem, David) Modified on 12/1/2021 (baf, ).
December 1, 2021 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted DOCUMENT #8 . DOCUMENT WAS FILED IN THE INCORRECT CASE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/27/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 1/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/17/2021. (mem)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brian K. Donovan, Elizabeth A. Donovan.(Herrin, Cyrus)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. All Defendants. (Clem, David)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Elizabeth A. Donovan. (mem)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Brian K. Donovan. (mem)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for Truist Bank. (Clem, David)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian K Donovan, Elizabeth A Donovan ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8618544.), filed by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Guaranties, #4 Exhibit 4 - Demand, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clem, David)
October 8, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 8, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truist Bank v. Donovan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truist Bank
Represented By: David Matthew Clem
Represented By: Sean Michael Affleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K. Donovan
Represented By: Cyrus Daniel Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Donovan
Represented By: Cyrus Daniel Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?