Hayes v. Monster Specialized, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BRANDY HAYES
Defendant: MONSTER SPECIALIZED, LLC and David Lee Harris
Case Number: 4:2021cv00836
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Lee Harris, Monster Specialized, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Affidavit B)(Ingram, Thomas) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (mem).
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND ORDER ON JURISDICTIONAL PLEADING: the Court ORDERS that, by no late than November 10, 2021, Defendants must file a second amended notice of removal that alleges facts sufficient to invoke federal jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/28/2021. (mem)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Lee Harris, Monster Specialized, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of E. Kittle)(Ingram, Thomas) Modified text on 10/26/2021 (mem).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON JURISDICTIONAL PLEADING: the Court ORDERS that, by no later than October 27, 2021, Defendants must file an amended notice of removal that alleges facts sufficient to invoke federal jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/20/2021. (mem)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 ***ANSWER ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #8 Complaint by David Lee Harris, Monster Specialized, LLC.(mem)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 ***COMPLAINT ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against David Lee Harris, Monster Specialized, LLC, filed by Brandy Hayes.(mem)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by BRANDY HAYES (Goudarzi, Joel)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BRANDY HAYES. (Goudarzi, Joel)
October 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mem)
October 19, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mem, )
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal: Certificate of Notice of Removal (Ingram, Thomas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal: Certificate of Interested Persons. (Ingram, Thomas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal: Docket sheet, Plaintiffs Original Petition, Defendants Original Answer (Ingram, Thomas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal: Civil Cover Sheet (Ingram, Thomas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DAVID LEE HARRIS, MONSTER SPECIALIZED, LLC from 62nd Judicial Court, Hopkins County, case number CV44799. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8628747), filed by DAVID LEE HARRIS, MONSTER SPECIALIZED, LLC.(Ingram, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Monster Specialized, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDY HAYES
Represented By: Joel Brent Goudarzi
Represented By: Marty Leon Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSTER SPECIALIZED, LLC
Represented By: Roy L Stacy
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lee Harris
Represented By: Roy L Stacy
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?