Summit State Investment LLC v. Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Summit State Investment LLC
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company and Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv00957
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEEDING by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Tippett, Todd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2022: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Summit State Investment LLC (Flores, Marco)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 management conference set for 2/16/2022 at 1:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 2/1/2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/29/2021. (baf, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Austin Jacob Taylor on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Taylor, Austin)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/13/2021. (baf, )
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(baf, )
December 8, 2021 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(baf, )
December 8, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
December 8, 2021 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Employers Mutual Casualty Company from 199th Judicial District Court of Collin County, case number 199-06149-2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8701089), filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, State Court Docket Sheet, Complaint, & Answer #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Tippett, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit State Investment LLC v. Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit State Investment LLC
Represented By: Marco Dax Flores
Represented By: Jacob Scott Rogiers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Todd M Tippett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Austin Jacob Taylor
Represented By: Todd M Tippett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?